NH HB546 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB546
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-13 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2836h (Vote 15-3; Regular Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-13 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2836h (Vote 15-3; Regular Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the regulation of art therapists.
Title
Relative to the regulation of art therapists.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-13 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2836h (Vote 15-3; Regular Calendar) |
2019-10-23 | House | Executive Session: 11/06/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-10-22 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 11/06/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2019-10-15 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/22/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-10-02 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/15/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-06-10 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 06/11/2019 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-02-20 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Executive Session: 02/19/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-02-06 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-01-30 | House | Public Hearing: 02/06/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 3 P. 19 |
Same As/Similar To
HB546 (Carry Over) 2019-11-13 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2836h (Vote 15-3; Regular Calendar)