NH HB549 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB549
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-26 - Executive Session: 10/26/2021 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building302-304
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-26 - Executive Session: 10/26/2021 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building302-304
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the energy efficiency resource standard and the system benefits charge.
Title
Relative to the energy efficiency resource standard and the system benefits charge.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Vose [R] | Rep. Michael Harrington [R] | Rep. Keith Ammon [R] | Rep. Rene Nunez [R] |
Sen. Ruth Ward [R] | Sen. William Gannon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-26 | House | Executive Session: 10/26/2021 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building302-304 |
2021-10-01 | House | Public Hearing on non-germane Amendment # 2021-2158h: 10/12/2021 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2021-09-10 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/29/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2021-03-23 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Public Hearing: 02/22/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link: 1. To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/91732382660 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 2 P. 53 |
Same As/Similar To
HB549 (Carry Over) 2021-10-26 - Executive Session: 10/26/2021 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building302-304