NH HB551 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB551
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-14 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-14 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a school funding commission and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Establishing a school funding commission and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Rep. Mel Myler [D] | Rep. Mary Wallner [D] | Rep. Richard Ames [D] | Rep. Mary Heath [D] |
Rep. Tamara Le [D] | Rep. Joelle Martin [D] | Rep. Sallie Fellows [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-27 - House - OTPA (Y: 207 N: 148 NV: 14 Abs: 31) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-14 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) |
2019-10-02 | House | Executive Session: 11/12/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2019-10-02 | House | Division II Work Session: 10/29/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 209 |
2019-03-27 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-03-22 | House | Executive Session: 03/27/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2019-03-06 | House | Finance Division II Work Session: 03/13/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 209 |
2019-02-27 | House | Finance Division II Work Session: 03/01/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 209 |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to Finance 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 53 |
2019-02-27 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0245h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 207-148 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 50 |
2019-02-27 | House | Amendment # 2019-0576h (NT): Amendment Failed DV 156-199 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 50 |
2019-02-27 | House | Amendment # 2019-0245h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 50 |
2019-02-20 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0576h (NT) |
2019-02-20 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0245h for 02/27/2019 (Vote 12-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 17 |
2019-02-12 | House | Executive Session: 02/19/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-01-23 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 01/30/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-01-23 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 01/29/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Education House Journal 3 P. 19 |
Same As/Similar To
HB551 (Carry Over) 2019-11-14 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar)