NH HB564 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-10-20 - House Retained Bill - Rescheduled Executive Session 10/27/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-10-20 - House Retained Bill - Rescheduled Executive Session 10/27/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the adoption of forms by the department of revenue administration for the filing of taxes.
Title
Relative to the adoption of forms by the department of revenue administration for the filing of taxes.
Sponsors
Rep. David Bettencourt [R] | Sen. David Boutin [R] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Rep. Jennifer Coffey [R] |
Rep. Shawn Jasper [R] | Rep. Neal Kurk [R] | Rep. Stephen Stepanek [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-20 | House Retained Bill - Rescheduled Executive Session 10/27/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2011-10-05 | House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/26/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 ==RECESSED== | |
2011-10-05 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/13/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2011-09-21 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/4/2011 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2011-08-16 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/15/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 ==TIME CHANGE (Orig 10:00 Amendment)== | |
2011-08-16 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 8/30/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2011-06-02 | House Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 6/7/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2011-03-09 | House Retained in Committee; House Calendar 27, PG.826 | |
2011-02-23 | House Executive Session: 2/24/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 ==TIME CHANGE (Orig 12:30 PM)== | |
2011-02-09 | House Public Hearing: 2/22/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2011-01-24 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Ways and Means; House Journal 11, PG. 191 |