NH HB570 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Failed on March 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-27 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 31, PG.1024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Failed on March 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-27 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 31, PG.1024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to school building aid grant eligibility for the White Mountain Regional school district.
Title
Relative to school building aid grant eligibility for the White Mountain Regional school district.
Sponsors
Rep. Herbert Richardson [R] | Rep. Laurence Rappaport [R] | Rep. Gene Chandler [R] | Rep. Leon Rideout [R] |
Sen. Jeff Woodburn [D] | Rep. Norman Major [R] | Rep. Robert Theberge [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-27 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 31, PG.1024 |
2013-03-20 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 27 (Vote 23-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 25, PG.706 |
2013-03-12 | House | Executive Session: 3/19/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2013-03-08 | House | Division II Work Session: 3/14/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 209 |
2013-03-06 | House | Referred to Finance; House Journal 24, PG.671-672 |
2013-03-06 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Division Vote 198-146; House Journal 24, PG.671-672 |
2013-02-12 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 6 (Vote 16-2; Part I Regular Calendar); House Calendar 20, PG.416-417 |
2013-02-11 | House | Continued Executive Session: 2/14/2013 12:30 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2013-02-07 | House | Executive Session: 2/12/2013 1:45 PM Legislative Office Building 207 ==RECESSED== |
2013-01-30 | House | Public Hearing: 2/7/2013 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Education; House Journal 12, PG.200 |