NH HB579 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-14 - House Signed By Governor 06/14/2011; Effective 08/13/2011; Chapter 0173
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-14 - House Signed By Governor 06/14/2011; Effective 08/13/2011; Chapter 0173
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Exempting department of revenue administration guidelines from the right-to-know law and relative to the position of revenue counsel.
Title
Exempting department of revenue administration guidelines from the right-to-know law and relative to the position of revenue counsel.
Sponsors
Rep. Neal Kurk [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-14 | House Signed By Governor 06/14/2011; Effective 08/13/2011; Chapter 0173 | |
2011-06-08 | House Enrolled; House Journal 51, PG.1724 | |
2011-06-08 | Senate Enrolled | |
2011-05-25 | House House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1583s(NT) (Rep Stepanek): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 46, PG.1582 | |
2011-05-04 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 15, Pg.312 | |
2011-05-04 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 1583s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 15, Pg.311 | |
2011-05-04 | Senate Committee Amendment 1583s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 15, Pg.311 | |
2011-04-26 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2011-1583s, New Title, 5/4/11; Senate Calendar 22 | |
2011-04-13 | Senate Hearing: 4/19/11, Room 100, State House, 1:45 p.m; Senate Calendar 20 | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Ways & Means; Senate Journal 11, Pg.193 | |
2011-03-15 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.742 | |
2011-02-24 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 15 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.543 | |
2011-02-23 | House Executive Session: 2/24/2011 12:30 PM Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2011-02-09 | House Public Hearing: 2/22/2011 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2011-01-24 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Ways and Means; House Journal 11, PG. 192 |