NH HB588 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-25 - II. Remainder Effective 07/19/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-25 - II. Remainder Effective 07/19/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Extending the instream flow pilot program for 2 years and establishing a commission to study opportunities and options to improve the sustainability of the fish and game department.
Title
Extending the instream flow pilot program for 2 years and establishing a commission to study opportunities and options to improve the sustainability of the fish and game department.
Sponsors
Rep. Judith Spang [D] | Rep. Marjorie Smith [D] | Sen. John Reagan [R] | Rep. Jane Beaulieu [D] |
Sen. David Watters [D] | Rep. Philip Ginsburg [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-25 | House | II. Remainder Effective 07/19/2013 |
2013-07-25 | House | I. Section 8 Effective 11/01/2013 |
2013-07-25 | House | Signed By Governor 07/19/2013; Chapter 0241 |
2013-06-26 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 52, PG.1711 |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-06-25 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2013-2038e Adopted [Recess of 6/5/13]; House Journal 49, PG.1657 |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2038e Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-06-05 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1520s(NT) and #1848s(NT) (Rep Chandley): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 49, PG.1586 |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 1520s, New Title, 1848s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Sen. Odell Floor Amendment #2013-1848s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Without Objection Rule 3-17 is Suspended to Allow Non-Germane Amendment 1848s, 2/3 necessary, Motion Adopted; |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Chair Ruled Non-Germane Amendment |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1520s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Without Objection Rule 3-17 is Suspended to Allow Non-Germane Amendment 1520s, New Title, 2/3 necessary, Motion Adopted; |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Chair Ruled Non-Germane Amendment |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-1520s, New Title, 5/23/13; Senate Calendar 21 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Hearing: 4/24/13, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 9:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 17 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Energy & Natural Resources |
2013-03-20 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 27, PG.883-884 |
2013-03-06 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; House Calendar 23 PG.595 |
2013-03-06 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 20 (Vote 11-7; Part II, Regular Calendar); House Calendar 23 PG.595 |
2013-02-13 | House | Executive Session: 3/5/2013 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 |
2013-02-13 | House | Public Hearing: 2/26/2013 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 305 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Resources, Recreation and Development; House Journal 12, PG.201 |