NH HB590 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-11 - Signed by the Governor on 7/11/2014; Chapter 0164; Effective date 9/9/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-11 - Signed by the Governor on 7/11/2014; Chapter 0164; Effective date 9/9/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the unauthorized practice of law.
Title
Relative to the unauthorized practice of law.
Sponsors
Rep. Kathleen Souza [R] | Rep. Larry Gagne [R] | Rep. Laura Jones [R] | Rep. Dudley Dumaine [R] |
Rep. Kenneth Weyler [R] | Rep. William Infantine [R] | Rep. Daniel Itse [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-11 | House | Signed by the Governor on 7/11/2014; Chapter 0164; Effective date 9/9/2014. |
2014-06-18 | House | Enrolled (In recess of 6/4/14) |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-06-04 | House | Conference Committee Report #1901c; Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 1901c; Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 15 |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Conference Committee Report #2014-1901c; Senate Amendment, Filed |
2014-05-22 | House | Committee of Conference Meeting: 5/22/2014; 3:00 PM; Legislative Office Building 208 |
2014-05-20 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Carson, Boutin, and Lasky |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Sen. Carson Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-05-07 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps Woodbury, Rowe, Heffron, Watrous |
2014-05-07 | House | Non-Concur with Senate Amendment and Requests C of C (Rep. M. Smith) Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1351s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 10 |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1351s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-1351s, 4/24/14; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 15 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Hearing: 4/1/14, Room 100, State House, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 11 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Judiciary |
2014-01-08 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0785h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-01-08 | House | Amendment #0785h Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-11-18 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-0785h for Jan 8 (Vote 14-2; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 1 |
2013-09-10 | House | Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/22/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 |
2013-07-23 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 9/10/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 |
2013-04-30 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 5/7/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208 |
2013-03-07 | House | Retained in Committee |
2013-03-06 | House | Executive Session: 3/7/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 |
2013-03-06 | House | Recommit (Rep Rowe): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG.677 |
2013-03-06 | House | Remove from Table (Rep Rowe): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG.677 |
2013-02-20 | House | Laid on Table (Rep Tamburello): Motion Adopted Division Vote 277-83; House Journal 21, PG.480-482 |
2013-02-20 | House | Recommit (Rep Groen): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 178-182; House Journal 21, PG.480-482 |
2013-02-14 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass; House Calendar 15, PG.272 |
2013-02-14 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 20 (Vote 13-5; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 15, PG.272 |
2013-02-06 | House | Executive Session: 2/12/2013 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208 |
2013-01-29 | House | Public Hearing: 2/5/2013 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Judiciary; House Journal 12, PG.201 |