NH HB593 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB593
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-09-07 - ==RESCHEDULED== Subcommittee Work Session: 09/22/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204 House Calendar 36
Pending: House Criminal Justice and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-09-07 - ==RESCHEDULED== Subcommittee Work Session: 09/22/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204 House Calendar 36
Pending: House Criminal Justice and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the forfeiture of assets in connection with a drug offense.
Title
Relative to the forfeiture of assets in connection with a drug offense.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-07 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Subcommittee Work Session: 09/22/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204 House Calendar 36 |
2023-09-06 | House | ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 09/21/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204 House Calendar 36 |
2023-08-31 | House | ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 09/08/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-02-24 | House | Retained in Committee |
2023-02-16 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/17/2023 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building202-204 |
2023-02-07 | House | Executive Session: 02/24/2023 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-01-31 | House | Public Hearing: 02/09/2023 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-01-12 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 3 P. 22 |
Same As/Similar To
HB593 (Carry Over) 2023-09-07 - ==RESCHEDULED== Subcommittee Work Session: 09/22/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204 House Calendar 36