NH HB594 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-25 - III. Remainder Effective 09/22/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-25 - III. Remainder Effective 09/22/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the general consumer credit laws of the state, making a technical correction, and relative to a town clerk and tax collector electing to be a member in the retirement system.
Title
Relative to the general consumer credit laws of the state, making a technical correction, and relative to a town clerk and tax collector electing to be a member in the retirement system.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Walz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-25 | House | III. Remainder Effective 09/22/2013 |
2013-07-25 | House | II. Section 32 Effective as Provided in Section 33 |
2013-07-25 | House | I. Section 30 Effective as Provided in Section 31 |
2013-07-25 | House | Signed By Governor 07/24/2013; Chapter 0257 |
2013-06-26 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 52, PG.1716 |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-06-26 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2013-2195e(NT) Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 52, PG.1715-1716 |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2195e, New Title, Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-06-26 | House | Conference Committee Report #2120c Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 52, PG.1700 |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 2120c; Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Conference Committee Report #2013-2120c; Senate Amendment, Filed |
2013-06-12 | House | Committee of Conference Meeting: 6/18/2013 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2013-06-12 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Cataldo, Stiles, Pierce |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Sen. Sanborn Moved Accede to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-06-12 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps Butler, John Hunt, Goley, and Muns [Recess of 6/5/13]; House Journal 49, PG.1651 |
2013-06-12 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment #1497s, #2009s(NT) and #2016s(NT) and Requests C of C (Rep Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote [Recess of 6/5/13]; House Journal 49, PG.1651 |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 2009s, New Title, 2016s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment #2013-2016s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Sen. Reagan Floor Amendment #2013-2009s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 6/6/13; Senate Calendar 23 |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1497s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1497s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-1497s, 5/23/13; Senate Calendar 21 |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Hearing: 4/4/13, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 2:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 14 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Commerce |
2013-03-20 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0716h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 27, PG.831-837 |
2013-03-20 | House | Amendment #0716h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 27, PG.831-837 |
2013-03-07 | House | Proposed Committee Amendment #2013-0716h; House Calendar 23 PG.635-640 |
2013-03-07 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0716h for Mar 20 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 23 PG.577 |
2013-02-27 | House | Continued Executive Session: 3/7/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2013-02-27 | House | Executive Session: 3/5/2013 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 ==RECESSED== |
2013-02-06 | House | Public Hearing: 2/22/2013 11:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 12, PG.202 |