NH HB595 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-18 - Died on the Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-18 - Died on the Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to banning abortion after viability.
Title
Relative to banning abortion after viability.
Sponsors
Sen. Keith Murphy [R] | Rep. Daniel Itse [R] | Rep. Lawrence Kappler [R] | Rep. Jeanine Notter [R] |
Rep. Kathleen Souza [R] | Rep. Dan McGuire [R] | Rep. Daniel Tamburello [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-18 | House | Died on the Table |
2015-03-12 | House | Lay on Table (Rep Rowe): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG. 1225-1226 |
2015-03-05 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2015-03-05 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0748h for Mar 11 (Vote 12-7; Regular Calendar); House Calendar19, PG. 429 |
2015-03-03 | House | Continued Executive Session: 3/5/2015 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 |
2015-02-25 | House | Executive Session: 3/3/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 ==RECESSED== |
2015-02-04 | House | Public Hearing: 2/10/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; House Journal 12, PG. 231 |