NH HB598 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-15 - House Signed by the Governor 07/13/2010; Effective 01/01/2011; Chapter 0291
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-15 - House Signed by the Governor 07/13/2010; Effective 01/01/2011; Chapter 0291
Summary
Relative to the regulation of auctioneers by the state board of auctioneers.
Title
Relative to the regulation of auctioneers by the state board of auctioneers.
Sponsors
Rep. John Hunt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-15 | House Signed by the Governor 07/13/2010; Effective 01/01/2011; Chapter 0291 | |
2010-06-02 | Senate Enrolled | |
2010-06-02 | House Enrolled | |
2010-06-02 | Senate Enrolled Bill Amendment #2421 Adopted | |
2010-06-02 | House Enrolled Bill Amendment #2421 Adopted | |
2010-05-19 | House House Concurs with Senate Amendment #2429s & #0035s (Rep Harding): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 46, PG.2226 | |
2010-01-06 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 1, Pg.11 | |
2010-01-06 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 2429s, 0035s, Motion Adopted Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 1, Pg.11 | |
2010-01-06 | Senate Sen. Carson Floor Amendment 0035s Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; | |
2010-01-06 | Senate Committee Amendment 2429s Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 1, Pg.10 | |
2009-12-28 | Senate Committee Report; Ought to Pass with Amendment 2429s; 01/06/10; Senate Calendar 1 Pg.2 | |
2009-05-13 | Senate Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 15, Pg.318 | |
2009-05-07 | Senate Committee Report; Rereferred to Committee [05/13/09]; Senate Calendar 23 | |
2009-04-23 | Senate Hearing; April 28, 2009, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 2:50 p.m.; Senate Calendar 21 | |
2009-04-08 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 11, Pg.236 | |
2009-04-08 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 31, PG.1282 | |
2009-04-01 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass or April 8 Consent Calendar (vote 18-0); House Calendar 26, PG.920 | |
2009-03-25 | House Executive Session: 3/31/2009 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2009-03-18 | House Full Committee Work Session: 3/27/2009 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2009-03-04 | House Referred to Ways and Means; House Journal 21, PG.606 | |
2009-03-04 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #0296h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.605-606 | |
2009-03-04 | House Amendment #0296h Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.606 | |
2009-02-17 | House Proposed Amendment #0296h; House Calendar 15, PG.334 | |
2009-02-17 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0296h for Mar 4 Regular Calendar (vote 10-9); House Calendar 16, PG.375 | |
2009-02-04 | House Executive Session: 2/12/2009 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2009-02-04 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 2/11/2009 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2009-01-29 | House Public Hearing: 2/3/2009 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2009-01-08 | House Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 12, PG.234 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=311&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |