NH HB616 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-15 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.705
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-15 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.705
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to coverage for divorced spouses.
Title
Relative to coverage for divorced spouses.
Sponsors
Rep. James Headd [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-15 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.705 | |
2011-03-09 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 15 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.526 | |
2011-03-01 | House Executive Session: 3/9/2011 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-02-09 | House Public Hearing: 3/3/2011 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-01-25 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 11, PG. 193 |