NH HB616 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-07 - Signed by the Governor on 7/6/2015; Chapter 201; Effective 9/4/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-07 - Signed by the Governor on 7/6/2015; Chapter 201; Effective 9/4/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to compensation to claimants under the victims' assistance fund.
Title
Relative to compensation to claimants under the victims' assistance fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-07 | House | Signed by the Governor on 7/6/2015; Chapter 201; Effective 9/4/2015 |
2015-06-24 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 54, PG. 2102 |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 6/24/2015); Senate Journal 19 |
2015-06-03 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1490s (Rep Rowe): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 44, PG. 1813 |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1490s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 13 |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1490s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1490s, 5/7/15; Senate Calendar 20 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Hearing: 3/31/15, Room 100, State House, 9:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 15 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 8 |
2015-02-18 | House | Second Committee Referral Waived by Committee Chair; House Journal 20, PG. 521 |
2015-02-18 | House | Referred to Finance |
2015-02-18 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0221h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 20, PG. 517 |
2015-02-18 | House | Amendment #0221h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 20, PG. 517 |
2015-02-12 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0221h (NT) for Feb 18 (Vote 15-1; Regular Calendar); House Calendar13, PG. 247 |
2015-02-05 | House | Executive Session: 2/12/2015 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 |
2015-01-28 | House | Public Hearing: 2/5/2015 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; House Journal 12, PG. 232 |