NH HB616 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB616
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 P. 67
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 P. 67
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to administration of the New Hampshire's renewable portfolio standard.
Title
Relative to administration of the New Hampshire's renewable portfolio standard.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark McLean [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 P. 67 |
2023-11-14 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB616-FN 11/06/2023 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 49 P. 21 |
2023-10-25 | House | Executive Session: 11/06/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 House Calendar 43 |
2023-09-05 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 09/26/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 House Calendar 36 |
2023-02-21 | House | Retained in Committee |
2023-02-16 | House | Executive Session: 02/21/2023 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-02-01 | House | Public Hearing: 02/07/2023 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-01-12 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 3 P. 23 |
Same As/Similar To
HB616 (Carry Over) 2023-09-05 - Full Committee Work Session: 09/26/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 House Calendar 36