NH HB624 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-27 - Signed by the Governor on 6/16/2014; Chapter 0121; Effective 6/16/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-27 - Signed by the Governor on 6/16/2014; Chapter 0121; Effective 6/16/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Waiving the residency requirement for in-state tuition rates for veterans attending institutions in the university system of New Hampshire and the community college system of New Hampshire and relative to funding for New Hampshire hospital psychiatric crisis beds.
Title
Waiving the residency requirement for in-state tuition rates for veterans attending institutions in the university system of New Hampshire and the community college system of New Hampshire and relative to funding for New Hampshire hospital psychiatric crisis beds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-27 | House | Signed by the Governor on 6/16/2014; Chapter 0121; Effective 6/16/2014 |
2014-05-28 | House | Enrolled (In recess of 5/15/14) |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-05-14 | House | Concur with Senate Amendment #0043s, (Rep Gile); Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0043s, New Title, Motion Adopted Voice Vote; OT3rdg |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0043s, New Title, Sections 3-5 and 6, Amendment Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0043s, New Title, Sections 1-2 and 6, Amendment Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-01-30 | Senate | The Chair Ruled the Question Divisible: Sections 1-2, and 6 and Sections 3-5, and 6 |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Sen. Pierce Moved to Divide the Question: Section 1-2, and 6 and Section 3-5, and 6 |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Without Objection Rule 3-17 is Suspended to Allow Non-Germane Amendment 0043s, 2/3 necessary, Motion Adopted; |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Chair Ruled Non-Germane Amendment |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0043s, New Title, 1/30/14; Senate Calendar 4 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 5/2/13; Senate Calendar 18 |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Hearing: 4/2/13, Room 103, State House, 1:45 p.m.; Senate Calendar 14 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Finance |
2013-03-21 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0559h: Motion Adopted Division Vote 281-28; House Journal 29, PG.990 |
2013-03-21 | House | Amendment #0559h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 29, PG.990 |
2013-03-05 | House | Proposed Committee Amendment #2013-0559h; House Calendar 23 PG.641 |
2013-03-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0559h for Mar 20 (Vote 17-3; Part II, Regular Calendar); House Calendar 23 PG.589-590 |
2013-02-26 | House | Executive Session: 3/5/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2013-02-06 | House | Public Hearing: 2/21/2013 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303 ==ROOM CHANGE (Orig Legislative Office Building 207)== |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Education; House Journal 12, PG.203 |