NH HB648 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - House III. Remainder Effective 03/05/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - House III. Remainder Effective 03/05/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to eminent domain by public utilities and establishing a commission to investigate the procedural rights of the landowner when a petition is presented to the public utilities commission by a utility seeking eminent domain, develop a framework for the state to provide use rights to transmission developers on state owned rights-of-way, develop policies to encourage burying such lines where practicable, and establish a structure for payment.
Title
Relative to eminent domain by public utilities and establishing a commission to investigate the procedural rights of the landowner when a petition is presented to the public utilities commission by a utility seeking eminent domain, develop a framework for the state to provide use rights to transmission developers on state owned rights-of-way, develop policies to encourage burying such lines where practicable, and establish a structure for payment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | House III. Remainder Effective 03/05/2012 | |
2012-03-09 | House II. Section 8 Effective 11/01/2012 | |
2012-03-09 | House I. Section 1-5 Effective 05/04/2012 | |
2012-03-09 | House Signed by the Governor 03/05/2012; Chapter 0002 | |
2012-02-22 | House Enrolled; House Journal 20, PG.1250 | |
2012-02-15 | Senate Enrolled | |
2012-02-15 | House Enrolled Bill Amendment #2012-0723e Adopted; House Journal 16, PG.968 | |
2012-02-08 | Senate Enrolled Bill Amendment #0723e Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 5, Pg.123 | |
2012-02-08 | House House Concurs with Senate Amendment's (Rep J.Garrity): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 15, PG.904 | |
2012-01-25 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendments 0018s, New Title, 0350s, 0367s, New Title, 0373s, New Title, 0405s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 3, Pg.92 | |
2012-01-25 | Senate Sen. Larsen Floor Amendment #2012-0405s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 3, Pg.92 | |
2012-01-25 | Senate Sen. Bradley Moved Reconsideration of HB 648, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 3, Pg.89 | |
2012-01-25 | Senate Sen. Bragdon Moved to Rescind OT3rdg; Senate Journal 3, Pg.89 | |
2012-01-25 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendments 0018s, New Title, 0350s, 0367s, New Title, 0373s, New Title, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 3, Pg.80 | |
2012-01-25 | Senate Sen. Larsen Floor Amendment #2012-0373s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 3, Pg.80 | |
2012-01-25 | Senate Sen. Forrester Floor Amendment #2012-0367s, New Title, Regular Calendar 16Y-8N, Amendment Adopted; Senate Journal 3, Pg.79 | |
2012-01-25 | Senate Sen. Carson Floor Amendment #2012-0350s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 3, Pg.78 | |
2012-01-25 | Senate Committee Amendment 0018s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 3, Pg.78 | |
2012-01-18 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2012-0018s, New Title, 1/25/12 | |
2012-01-18 | Senate Special Order to 1/25/12 to the beginning of the regular calendar, Without Objection, Motion Adopted | |
2012-01-12 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2012-0018s, New Title, 1/18/12; Senate Calendar 3 | |
2011-06-01 | Senate Rereferred to Committee, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; Senate Journal 19, Pg.539 | |
2011-06-01 | Senate Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 6/1/11; Senate Calendar 26 | |
2011-06-01 | Senate Special Order to 1 pm, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; Senate Journal 19, Pg.520 | |
2011-06-01 | Senate Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 6/1/11; Senate Calendar 26 | |
2011-06-01 | Senate Special Order to the end of the Calendar, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; Senate Journal 19, Pg.517 | |
2011-05-26 | Senate Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 6/1/11; Senate Calendar 26 | |
2011-05-05 | Senate Hearing: 5/19/11, Representatives' Hall, 1:15 p.m.; Senate Calendar 23 | |
2011-04-27 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 15, Pg.291 | |
2011-03-30 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #1134h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 317-51; House Journal 34, PG.1133-1136 | |
2011-03-30 | House Amendment #1134h Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 34, PG.1133 | |
2011-03-23 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #2011-1134h; House Calendar 27, PG.853 | |
2011-03-23 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #1134h for Mar 30 (Vote 11-4; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 27, PG.821 | |
2011-03-16 | House Full Committee Work Session: 3/22/2011 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 ==Executive Session to Follow== | |
2011-03-15 | House Suspend House Rules to Allow Reporting Deadline to Be Extended No Later Than Mar 24 and House Action No Later Than Mar 31 (Reps Bettencourt & Wallner): Motion Adopted Voice Vote by Required Two-Thirds; House Journal 26, PG.693 | |
2011-03-01 | House Executive Session: 3/10/2011 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 | |
2011-02-23 | House Public Hearing: 3/9/2011 10:15 Amendment Representative's Hall | |
2011-02-16 | House Introduced and Referred to Science, Technology and Energy; House Journal 19, PG.439 | |
2011-02-16 | House Late Drafting and Introduction Approved by Rules Committee; House Journal 19, PG.439 |