NH HB648 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-24 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/21/2019; Chapter 115; I. Sec. 5 Eff: 01/01/2020 II. Rem. Eff: 08/20/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-24 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/21/2019; Chapter 115; I. Sec. 5 Eff: 01/01/2020 II. Rem. Eff: 08/20/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Defining and regulating service entities.
Title
Defining and regulating service entities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-24 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/21/2019; Chapter 115; I. Sec. 5 Eff: 01/01/2020 II. Rem. Eff: 08/20/2019 |
2019-05-31 | House | Enrolled 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 51 |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/30/2019); Senate Journal 19 |
2019-05-07 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-1758e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2019 House Journal 14 P. 42 |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-1758e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/02/2019); Senate Journal 16 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/25/2019; Senate Journal 14 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/25/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 19 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Hearing: 04/16/2019, Room 100, State House, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 18 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Introduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 12 |
2019-03-19 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0669h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 12 |
2019-03-19 | House | Amendment # 2019-0669h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 12 |
2019-03-12 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0669h for 03/19/2019 (Vote 19-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 5 |
2019-02-28 | House | Executive Session: 03/08/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2019-02-25 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/26/2019 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-02-13 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/21/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-02-13 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/21/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2019-02-06 | House | Public Hearing: 02/12/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-01-16 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 3 P. 23 |