NH HB649 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-11 - Signed by the Governor on 7/11/2014; Chapter 0166; Effective date 9/9/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-11 - Signed by the Governor on 7/11/2014; Chapter 0166; Effective date 9/9/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to earned time credits for certain prisoners participating in educational and rehabilitative programming.
Title
Relative to earned time credits for certain prisoners participating in educational and rehabilitative programming.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Gile [D] | Rep. Stephen Shurtleff [D] | Sen. Nancy Stiles [R] | Rep. Gene Charron [R] |
Sen. Lou D'Allesandro [D] | Rep. Carolyn Gargasz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-11 | House | Signed by the Governor on 7/11/2014; Chapter 0166; Effective date 9/9/2014. |
2014-05-22 | House | Enrolled (In recess of 5/15/2014) |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-05-07 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1213s (Rep. Pantelakos) Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1213s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 9 |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1213s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-1213s, 4/17/14; Senate Calendar 14 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Hearing: 3/18/14, Room 100, State House, 9:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 9 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Judiciary |
2014-01-08 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #2356h Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-01-08 | House | Amendment #2356h Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2013-11-22 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-2356h for Jan 8 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 1 |
2013-10-02 | House | Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/30/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2013-08-20 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 9/19/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2013-04-23 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 4/30/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2013-04-17 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 4/25/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2013-04-17 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 4/23/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2013-02-28 | House | Retained in Committee |
2013-02-20 | House | Executive Session: 2/28/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2013-02-13 | House | Public Hearing: 2/19/2013 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety; House Journal 12, PG.204 |