NH HB650 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-29 - Signed by the Governor on 7/28/2014; Chapter 0265; Effective Date 7/1/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to instituting a bus service between Claremont, New Hampshire and Lebanon, New Hampshire.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to instituting a bus service between Claremont, New Hampshire and Lebanon, New Hampshire.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-01-29 - House - OTPA (Y: 192 N: 89 NV: 81 Abs: 31) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-07-29HouseSigned by the Governor on 7/28/2014; Chapter 0265; Effective Date 7/1/2014.
2014-05-28HouseEnrolled (In recess of 5/15/2014)
2014-05-22SenateEnrolled
2014-05-15HouseConcur with Senate Amendment #1339s (Rep. Bouchard) Motion Adopted Voice Vote
2014-04-24SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 1339s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 10
2014-04-24SenateCommittee Amendment 1339s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote
2014-04-24SenateSen. Pierce Moved to Remove HB 650 from the Consent Calendar
2014-04-16SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-1339s, 4/24/14; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 15
2014-04-02SenateHearing: 4/8/14, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 1:15 p.m.; Senate Calendar 13
2014-03-27SenateIntroduced and Referred to Transportation
2014-03-26HouseOught to Pass with Amendment #0874h (NT) Motion Adopted Div 259-52
2014-03-26HouseAmendment #2014-0874h (NT) Amendment Adopted Div 275-33
2014-03-26HouseReconsider (Rep. Daniel Eaton) Motion Adopted Voice Vote
2014-03-26HouseAmendment #2014-0874h (NT) Amendment Adopted Voice Vote
2014-03-19HouseRemoved from Consent (Rep. James Webb)
2014-03-14HouseProposed Committee Amendment #2014-0874h (New Title)
2014-03-14HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0874h (Vote 25-0; Consent Calendar)
2014-02-25House===CONTINUED=== Executive Session: 3/06/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211
2014-02-21HouseDivision II Work Session: 3/4/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 209
2014-02-20HouseExecutive Session: 2/20/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 ===RECESSED===
2014-02-12House==RESCHEDULED== Work Session: 2/18/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 209
2014-02-07House===CANCELLED=== Executive Session: 2/18/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211
2014-02-06House===CANCELLED=== Division II Work Session: 2/13/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 209
2014-02-06House===CANCELLED=== Public Hearing: 2/18/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211
2014-02-06HousePublic Hearing: 2/18/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211
2014-01-29HouseReferred to Finance
2014-01-29HouseOught to Pass with Amendment #0294h Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 192-89
2014-01-29HouseAdopt Amendment #0294h Amendment Adopted Voice Vote
2013-11-18HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-0294h for Jan 8 (Vote 13-5; Regular Calendar)
2013-10-15House==TIME CHANGE==Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/29/2013 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203
2013-10-15HouseRetained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 10/29/2013 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203
2013-09-10HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/25/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203
2013-02-19HouseRetained in Committee
2013-02-13HouseExecutive Session: 2/19/2013 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203
2013-02-07HousePublic Hearing: 2/12/2013 3:30 PM Legislative Office Building 203
2013-01-03HouseIntroduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Transportation; House Journal 12, PG.204

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback