NH HB650 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-30 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-30 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study the economic challenges of employed persons serving in the New Hampshire legislature.
Title
Establishing a committee to study the economic challenges of employed persons serving in the New Hampshire legislature.
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Loughman [D] | Rep. Timothy Josephson [D] | Rep. Israel Piedra [D] | Rep. Jacqueline Chretien [D] |
Rep. Matthew Wilhelm [D] | Rep. Willis Griffith [D] | Rep. Joe Alexander [R] | Rep. Robert Cushing [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - House - OTP (Y: 203 N: 141 NV: 33 Abs: 23) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 05/30/2019; Senate Calendar 24 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Hearing: 05/08/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 10:15 am; Senate Calendar 20 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Introduced 03/14/2019 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 9 |
2019-03-07 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 203-141 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 52 |
2019-02-28 | House | Special Order to 03/07/2019 Without Objection House Journal 7 P. 62 |
2019-02-21 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-02-21 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/27/2019 (Vote 7-4; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 31 |
2019-02-06 | House | Executive Session: 02/20/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-02-06 | House | Public Hearing: 02/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-01-16 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Legislative Administration House Journal 3 P. 23 |