NH HB656 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-09-28 - House ==CANCELLED== Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/12/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Status: Introduced on January 8 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-09-28 - House ==CANCELLED== Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/12/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Summary
Relative to collection of the education property tax and establishing a program to rebate certain excessive property tax payments of eligible taxpayers.
Title
Relative to collection of the education property tax and establishing a program to rebate certain excessive property tax payments of eligible taxpayers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-28 | House ==CANCELLED== Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/12/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2010-09-28 | House Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/5/2010 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2010-09-22 | House Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/28/2010 1:01 PM Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2010-09-10 | House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/13/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2010-03-17 | House Referred to Ways and Means for Interim Study; House Journal 26, PG.1365 | |
2010-01-13 | House Refer to Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 9, PG.442 | |
2010-01-06 | House Special Ordered to Next Session Date in Regular Calendar Order; House Journal 6, PG.310 | |
2009-11-19 | House Proposed Minority Committee Amendment #2532h; House Calendar 1, PG.42-45 | |
2009-11-19 | House Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2532h; House Calendar 2, PG.100 | |
2009-11-19 | House Majority Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study for Jan 6 Regular Calendar (vote 11-8); House Calendar 2, PG.100 | |
2009-11-02 | House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 11/18/2009 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 ==TIME CHANGE (Orig 9:00 Amendment)== | |
2009-11-01 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 11/17/2009 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2009-10-15 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 11/05/2009 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2009-04-15 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 4/21/2009 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2009-03-19 | House Retained in Committee | |
2009-03-16 | House Executive Session: 3/18/2009 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 (Continued 3/19/09 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 If Needed) | |
2009-03-16 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 3/17/2009 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2009-03-11 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 3/16/2009 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2009-03-03 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 3/6/2009 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2009-02-04 | House Public Hearing: 2/11/2009 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2009-01-08 | House Introduced and Referred to Ways and Means; House Journal 12, PG.236 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=676&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |