NH HB689 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-18 - To Be Inexpedient to Legislate, Senate Rule 3-23, Adjournment 09/25/2019;
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-18 - To Be Inexpedient to Legislate, Senate Rule 3-23, Adjournment 09/25/2019;
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a student career and college investment program and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Establishing a student career and college investment program and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-27 - House - OTPA (Y: 216 N: 126 NV: 27 Abs: 31) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-18 | Senate | To Be Inexpedient to Legislate, Senate Rule 3-23, Adjournment 09/25/2019; |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Pending Motion Committee Amendment # 2019-1744s; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Sen. Feltes Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1744s, 05/15/2019; Senate Calendar 21 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Hearing: 04/09/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 17 |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Introduced 03/14/2019 and Referred to Education and Workforce Development; Senate Journal 9 |
2019-02-27 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0546h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 216-126 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 72 |
2019-02-27 | House | Amendment # 2019-0546h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 72 |
2019-02-20 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-02-20 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0546h for 02/27/2019 (Vote 14-4; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 18 |
2019-02-12 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/19/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-02-06 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/12/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-02-06 | House | ==RECESSED== Public Hearing: 02/12/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-01-23 | House | ==RECESSED== Public Hearing: 01/30/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-01-23 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 01/29/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Education House Journal 3 P. 26 |