NH HB698 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB698
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 57
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 57
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to foreign taxing jurisdictions compelling New Hampshire businesses to collect and remit sales taxes incurred by citizens of their respective states.
Title
Relative to foreign taxing jurisdictions compelling New Hampshire businesses to collect and remit sales taxes incurred by citizens of their respective states.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 57 |
2019-11-13 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 50 P. 16 |
2019-10-22 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 11/05/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-10-02 | House | Executive Session: 11/12/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-09-18 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/26/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-03-13 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-02-27 | House | Executive Session: 03/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-02-13 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/21/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-01-23 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/05/2019 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-01-23 | House | Public Hearing: 02/05/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 3 P. 26 |
Same As/Similar To
HB698 (Carry Over) 2019-11-13 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar)