NH HB712 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB712
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Vetoed on July 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-17 - Veto Sustained 09/16/2020: Regular Calendar 195-143 Lacking Necessary Two-Thirds Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-17 - Veto Sustained 09/16/2020: Regular Calendar 195-143 Lacking Necessary Two-Thirds Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to a family and medical leave insurance program.
Title
Relative to a family and medical leave insurance program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-17 - House - Veto Override (Y: 0 N: 11 NV: 344 Abs: 33) [FAIL]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Laid on Table (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Floor Amendment 1197s (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-08 - House - OTPA (Y: 215 N: 141 NV: 22 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Laid on Table (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Floor Amendment 1197s (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-08 - House - OTPA (Y: 215 N: 141 NV: 22 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-17 | House | Veto Sustained 09/16/2020: Regular Calendar 195-143 Lacking Necessary Two-Thirds Vote |
2020-07-13 | House | Vetoed by Governor Sununu 07/10/2020 |
2020-07-06 | House | Enrolled 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 70 |
2020-07-06 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/29/2020); Senate Journal 9 |
2020-06-18 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2020-1503e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/11/2020 House Journal 9 P. 42 |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2020-1503e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/16/2020); Senate Journal 9 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/12/2020; Senate Journal 7 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved Laid on Table, Regular Calendar 10Y-14N, Motion Failed; 03/12/2020; Senate Journal 7 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment # 2020-1197s, Regular Calendar 10Y-14N, Amendment Failed; 03/12/2020; Senate Journal 7 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Without Objection, Sen. Morgan Moved the Question, Motion Adopted; 03/12/2020; Senate Journal 7 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Offered Floor Amendment # 2020-1197s; 03/12/2020; Senate Journal 7 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Special Order to 03/12/2020, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/11/2020 Senate Journal 6 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/11/2020; Senate Calendar 10 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Hearing: 03/03/2020, Room 100, State House, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 9 |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 2 |
2020-01-08 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-2786h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 215-141 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 123 |
2020-01-08 | House | Amendment # 2019-2786h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 123 |
2019-11-14 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2786h (Vote 13-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 50 P. 24 |
2019-10-02 | House | Executive Session: 11/12/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2019-10-02 | House | Division I Work Session: 10/22/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2019-03-27 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-03-22 | House | Executive Session: 03/27/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2019-03-07 | House | Finance Division I Work Session: 03/13/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 212 |
2019-02-28 | House | Finance Division I Work Session: 03/06/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 212 |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to Finance 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 99 |
2019-02-27 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0418h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 199-133 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 95 |
2019-02-27 | House | Amendment # 2019-0418h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 95 |
2019-02-20 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-02-20 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0418h for 02/27/2019 (Vote 12-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 21 |
2019-02-11 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/12/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2019-02-05 | House | Executive Session: 02/13/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 307 |
2019-01-29 | House | Public Hearing: 02/06/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2019-01-18 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services House Journal 3 P. 27 |
Same As/Similar To
HB712 (Carry Over) 2019-11-14 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2786h (Vote 13-7; Regular Calendar)