NH HB90 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-09 - House Signed By Governor 06/08/2011; Effective 01/01/2012; Chapter 0149
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-09 - House Signed By Governor 06/08/2011; Effective 01/01/2012; Chapter 0149
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to enforcement of the requirement of boaters to have a safe boater education certificate.
Title
Relative to enforcement of the requirement of boaters to have a safe boater education certificate.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-09 | House Signed By Governor 06/08/2011; Effective 01/01/2012; Chapter 0149 | |
2011-06-01 | House Enrolled; House Journal 48, PG.1669 | |
2011-06-01 | Senate Enrolled; Senate Journal 20, Pg.546 | |
2011-05-18 | House House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1437s (Rep Packard): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 44, PG.1532 | |
2011-04-20 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 13, Pg.270 | |
2011-04-20 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 1437s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 13, Pg.268 | |
2011-04-20 | Senate Committee Amendment 1437s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 13, Pg.268 | |
2011-04-14 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2011-1437s, 4/20/11; Senate Calendar 20 | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Hearing: 3/24/11, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 16 | |
2011-03-09 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 9, Pg.102 | |
2011-03-02 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #0084h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 25, PG.687 | |
2011-03-02 | House Amendment #0084h Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 25, PG.687 | |
2011-02-17 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #2011-0084h; House Calendar 18, PG.409 | |
2011-02-17 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0084h for Mar 2 (Vote 12-3; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 18, PG.392 | |
2011-02-16 | House Executive Session: 2/16/2011 1:45 PM Legislative Office Building 203 | |
2011-01-25 | House ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 1/26/2011 Legislative Office Building 203 Following Session | |
2011-01-05 | House Public Hearing: 1/18/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203 | |
2010-12-30 | House Introduced 1/5/2011 and Referred to Transportation; House Journal 8, PG.130 |