NH HCR1 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-09 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 280-93; House Journal 16, PG.328-330
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-09 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 280-93; House Journal 16, PG.328-330
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging the congressional delegation to begin the process for a constitutional amendment establishing that human beings, not corporations, are entitled to constitutional rights.
Title
Urging the congressional delegation to begin the process for a constitutional amendment establishing that human beings, not corporations, are entitled to constitutional rights.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-09 - House - ITL (Y: 280 N: 93 NV: 26 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-09 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 280-93; House Journal 16, PG.328-330 | |
2011-01-20 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 9 (Vote 8-5; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 10, PG.151 | |
2011-01-14 | House Executive Session: 1/20/2011 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 | |
2011-01-05 | House Public Hearing: 1/13/2011 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203 | |
2010-12-22 | House Introduced 1/5/2011 and Referred to State-Federal Relations and Veterans Affairs; House Journal 8, PG.131 |