NH HR6 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-31 - Lay on Table (Rep. Ley): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/31/2019 House Journal 4 P. 16
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-31 - Lay on Table (Rep. Ley): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/31/2019 House Journal 4 P. 16
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging the United States to lead a global effort to prevent nuclear war.
Title
Urging the United States to lead a global effort to prevent nuclear war.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-31 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. Ley): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/31/2019 House Journal 4 P. 16 |
2019-01-24 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2019-01-24 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/31/2019 (Vote 11-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 9 |
2019-01-11 | House | Executive Session: 01/23/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2019-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/16/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206 |
2018-12-28 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to State-Federal Relations and Veterans Affairs House Journal 2 P. 47 |