NH SB1 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Signed by the Governor on 03/21/2013; Chapter 0005; Effective 05/20/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-25 - Signed by the Governor on 03/21/2013; Chapter 0005; Effective 05/20/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Increasing the research and development tax credit against the business profits tax and relative to the report of the commissioner of resources and economic development on the research and development tax credit.
Title
Increasing the research and development tax credit against the business profits tax and relative to the report of the commissioner of resources and economic development on the research and development tax credit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-13 - House - OTP/AM 0708H(NT) (Y: 342 N: 7 NV: 12 Abs: 36) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-25 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 03/21/2013; Chapter 0005; Effective 05/20/2013 |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Enrolled 3/14/13 |
2013-03-19 | House | Enrolled During Recess of Mar 13 Session; House Journal 26, PG.828 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Sen. Odell Moved Concur with House Amendment #0708h, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-03-13 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0708h(NT): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 342-7; House Journal 26, PG.797-800 |
2013-03-13 | House | Floor Amendment #2013-0708h(NT) (Rep Almy): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.797-798 |
2013-03-13 | House | Amendment #0547h(NT): Amendment Failed Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.797 |
2013-02-28 | House | Proposed Committee Amendment #2013-0547h (New Title); House Calendar 22, PG.571 |
2013-02-28 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0547h(NT) for Mar 13 (Vote 18-0; Part II, Regular Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.520 |
2013-02-20 | House | Executive Session: 2/26/2013 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2013-02-13 | House | Public Hearing: 2/19/2013 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2013-02-04 | House | Introduced During Recess of 1/30/2013 Session and Referred to Ways and Means; House Journal 14, PG.260 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 23Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 4 |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 1/31/13; Senate Calendar 6 |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Hearing: 1/22/13, Room 103, State House, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 5 |
2013-01-03 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Ways & Means; Senate Journal 4 |