NH SB115 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Signed by the Governor on 03/12/2013; Chapter 0003; Effective 03/12/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Signed by the Governor on 03/12/2013; Chapter 0003; Effective 03/12/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Naming a bridge in the town of Whitefield.
Title
Naming a bridge in the town of Whitefield.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Woodburn [D] | Rep. Leon Rideout [R] | Rep. Herbert Richardson [R] | Rep. Gene Chandler [R] |
Rep. Ralph Doolan [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-14 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-13 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 03/12/2013; Chapter 0003; Effective 03/12/2013 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled (2/14/13; Senate Journal 6 |
2013-03-06 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 24, PG.677 |
2013-03-06 | House | Order to Third Reading (Rep Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG.664-665 |
2013-03-06 | House | Print Remarks in Permanent Journal (Rep G.Richardson): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG.664-665 |
2013-03-06 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG.664-665 |
2013-02-26 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 6 (Vote 17-0; Part I Regular Calendar); House Calendar 20, PG.415 |
2013-02-21 | House | Executive Session: 2/26/2013 11:10 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 |
2013-02-21 | House | Public Hearing: 2/26/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 |
2013-02-20 | House | Introduced and Referred to Public Works and Highways; House Journal 21, PG.497 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 5 |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 2/14/13; Senate Calendar 8 |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Hearing: 2/5/13, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 2:15 p.m.; Senate Calendar 7 |
2013-01-03 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 4 |