NH SB127 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Signed by the Governor on 06/06/2013; Chapter 0068; Effective 08/05/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Signed by the Governor on 06/06/2013; Chapter 0068; Effective 08/05/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to registration of certain state contracts with the department of state and repealing the information practices act.
Title
Relative to registration of certain state contracts with the department of state and repealing the information practices act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/06/2013; Chapter 0068; Effective 08/05/2013 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-04-24 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 38, PG.1257 |
2013-04-24 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 38, PG.1239 |
2013-04-18 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for April 24 (Vote 17-1; Consent Calendar); House Calendar33, PG.1092 |
2013-04-10 | House | Executive Session: 4/18/2013 11:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2013-04-02 | House | Public Hearing: 4/9/2013 2:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2013-03-27 | House | Introduced and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 31, PG.1075 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 6 |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/7/13; Senate Calendar 10 |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Hearing: 2/5/13, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 1:30 p.m.; Senate Calendar 7 |
2013-01-03 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 4 |