NH SB127 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Enrolled on June 28 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Enrolled 06/27/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the Hampton judicial district and establishing the Hampton district court as a site for judicial branch family division cases

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the Hampton judicial district and establishing the Hampton district court as a site for judicial branch family division cases

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-28HouseEnrolled 06/27/2019
2019-06-28SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-06-13SenateSen. Hennessey Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/13/2019; Senate Journal 20
2019-05-23HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1608h (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 16
2019-05-23HouseAmendment # 2019-1608h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 16
2019-05-16HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1608h (NT) for 05/23/2019 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 25 P. 6
2019-04-23HouseExecutive Session: 05/14/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208
2019-04-18HousePublic Hearing on Amendment # 2019-1561h: 04/23/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208
2019-03-26HousePublic Hearing: 04/17/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208
2019-03-21HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 11 P. 69
2019-02-21SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/21/2019; Senate Journal 6
2019-02-13SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/21/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 11
2019-02-06SenateHearing: 02/12/2019, Room 100, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 10
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback