NH SB128 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-07 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/07/2011; Effective 06/07/2011; Chapter 0147
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-07 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/07/2011; Effective 06/07/2011; Chapter 0147
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study sources of funding for the search and rescue operations of the fish and game department.
Title
Establishing a committee to study sources of funding for the search and rescue operations of the fish and game department.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-07 | Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/07/2011; Effective 06/07/2011; Chapter 0147 | |
2011-06-01 | Senate Enrolled; Senate Journal 20, Pg.547 | |
2011-06-01 | House Enrolled; House Journal 48, PG.1669 | |
2011-05-18 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 44, PG.1534 | |
2011-04-28 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for May 18 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 39, PG.1320 | |
2011-04-20 | House Public Hearing: 4/28/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307==Executive Session To Follow== | |
2011-03-16 | House Introduced and Referred to Fish and Game and Marine Resources; House Journal 28, Pg.882 | |
2011-02-23 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 7, Pg.78 | |
2011-02-23 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 0397s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 7, Pg.69 | |
2011-02-23 | Senate Committee Amendment 0397s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 7, Pg.69 | |
2011-02-17 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2011-0397s, New Title, 2/23/11; Senate Calendar 12 | |
2011-01-27 | Senate Hearing: 2/10/2011, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 11:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 9 | |
2011-01-19 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources, Senate Journal 3, Pg.37 |