NH SB131 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-10-29 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 1/6/16; Senate Calendar 49
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-10-29 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 1/6/16; Senate Calendar 49
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing individuals and certain businesses to purchase health insurance from out-of-state companies.
Title
Authorizing individuals and certain businesses to purchase health insurance from out-of-state companies.
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Sanborn [R] | Sen. Gary Daniels [R] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Sen. Jerry Little [R] |
Sen. Regina Birdsell [R] | Sen. Jeanie Forrester [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-29 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 1/6/16; Senate Calendar 49 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote, Senate Journal 8 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 3/12/15; Senate Calendar 12 |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Hearing: 1/20/15, Room 100, State House, 1:45 p.m.; Senate Calendar 6 |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 4 |