NH SB131 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB131
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-16 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/16/2023; Senate Journal 10
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-16 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/16/2023; Senate Journal 10
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to health care provider contract standards.
Title
Relative to health care provider contract standards.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-16 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/16/2023; Senate Journal 10 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/16/2023; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 13 |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Hearing: 02/15/2023, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 10 |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 5 |
Same As/Similar To
SB131 (Carry Over) 2023-03-16 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/16/2023; Senate Journal 10