NH SB134 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB134
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-22 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/22/2023; Senate Journal 8
Pending: Senate Executive Departments and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-22 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/22/2023; Senate Journal 8
Pending: Senate Executive Departments and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to disability pensions for public safety employees who are victims of violence.
Title
Relative to disability pensions for public safety employees who are victims of violence.
Sponsors
Sen. Regina Birdsell [R] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Sen. Daryl Abbas [R] | Sen. Donna Soucy [D] |
Sen. Suzanne Prentiss [D] | Rep. Timothy Soucy [D] | Rep. Michael Moffett [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-22 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/22/2023; Senate Journal 8 |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 02/22/2023; Senate Calendar 11 |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Hearing: 02/08/2023, Room 103, State House, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 9 |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 5 |
Same As/Similar To
SB134 (Carry Over) 2023-02-22 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/22/2023; Senate Journal 8