NH SB14 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-16 - Senate Sen. Carson Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 9, Pg.136
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-16 - Senate Sen. Carson Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 9, Pg.136
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the brandishing of a firearm.
Title
Relative to the brandishing of a firearm.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Sen. Tom DeBlois [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-16 | Senate Sen. Carson Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 9, Pg.136 | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Rereferred to Committee Not Voted On | |
2011-03-11 | Senate Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 3/16/2011; Senate Calendar 15A | |
2011-03-03 | Senate Hearing: 3/10/11, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 14 | |
2011-01-19 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Judiciary, Senate Journal 3, Pg.32 |