NH SB150 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-19 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 1/6/16; Senate Calendar 49
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-19 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 1/6/16; Senate Calendar 49
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempting certain waste disposal system installer work from licensure and regulation by the electricians' board.
Title
Exempting certain waste disposal system installer work from licensure and regulation by the electricians' board.
Sponsors
Sen. David Boutin [R] | Sen. Sam Cataldo [R] | Rep. Joseph Pitre [R] | Sen. Andy Sanborn [R] |
Sen. John Reagan [R] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Sen. David Watters [D] | Sen. Jerry Little [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-19 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 1/6/16; Senate Calendar 49 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote, Senate Journal 8 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 3/12/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 12 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Hearing: 3/4/15, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 9:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 11 |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 4 |