NH SB154 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB154
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/03/2018; Senate Journal 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/03/2018; Senate Journal 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Making oral contraceptives available without a prescription.
Title
Making oral contraceptives available without a prescription.
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Sanborn [R] | Sen. Kevin Avard [R] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Sen. Bob Giuda [R] |
Sen. Martha Hennessey [D] | Sen. Daniel Innis [R] | Sen. John Reagan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/03/2018; Senate Journal 1 |
2017-09-22 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 01/03/2018; Senate Calendar 48 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/30/2017; |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Sen. French Moved to Remove SB 154 from the Consent Calendar; 03/29/2017; Senate Journal 11 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Special Order SB 154 to the beginning of Thursday 03/30/2017 Calendar, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/29/2017; |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/29/2017; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 16 |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Hearing: 02/02/2017, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 8 |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 5 |
Same As/Similar To
SB154 (Carry Over) 2017-09-22 - Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study