NH SB155 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-16 - Senate Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 9, Pg.145
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-16 - Senate Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 9, Pg.145
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to section 179 expense deductions under the business profits tax.
Title
Relative to section 179 expense deductions under the business profits tax.
Sponsors
Rep. Gene Chandler [R] | Sen. Jeanie Forrester [R] | Sen. James Forsythe [R] | Sen. John Gallus [R] |
Sen. Andy Sanborn [R] | Rep. Colette Worsman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-16 | Senate Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 9, Pg.145 | |
2011-03-08 | Senate Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 3/16/11; Senate Calendar 15 | |
2011-02-24 | Senate Hearing: 3/7/11, Room 100, State House, 1:45 p.m.; Senate Calendar 13 | |
2011-02-03 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Ways & Means, Senate Journal 5, Pg.46 |