NH SB168 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 28 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Enrolled 06/27/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to class 2 obligations under the electric renewable portfolio standards.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to class 2 obligations under the electric renewable portfolio standards.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-13 - Senate - Concur (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - OTPA (Y: 217 N: 139 NV: 8 Abs: 34) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-28HouseEnrolled 06/27/2019
2019-06-28SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-06-13SenateSen. Fuller Clark Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; 06/13/2019; Senate Journal 20
2019-06-06HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1894h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 217-139 06/06/2019
2019-06-06HouseAmendment # 2019-1894h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/06/2019
2019-05-22HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-05-22HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1894h for 06/05/2019 (Vote 12-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 27 P. 20
2019-05-08House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 05/15/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 304
2019-05-07HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 05/09/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 304
2019-05-06HouseFull Committee Work Session: 05/07/2019 09:55 am Legislative Office Building 304
2019-05-01House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 05/07/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304
2019-04-10HousePublic Hearing: 04/17/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 304
2019-04-01HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 11 P. 73
2019-03-28SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1180s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11
2019-03-28SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-1180s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11
2019-03-20SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1180s, 03/28/2019; Senate Calendar 15
2019-03-06SenateHearing: 03/12/2019, Room 103, State House, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 13
2019-01-22SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=1090&sy=2019&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB168
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&id=1078&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=1078
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&txtFormat=html&v=HA&id=1078
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=110&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=SB0168&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB168&ddlsponsors=&lsr=1090
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=222&sy=2019&lb=H&eb=SB0168&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB168&ddlsponsors=&lsr=1090
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=216&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=SB0168&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB168&ddlsponsors=&lsr=1090

Bill Comments

feedback