NH SB176 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-14 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/14/2011; Effective 08/13/2011; Chapter 0187
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-14 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/14/2011; Effective 08/13/2011; Chapter 0187
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to marriage licenses.
Title
Relative to marriage licenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-14 | Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/14/2011; Effective 08/13/2011; Chapter 0187 | |
2011-06-08 | Senate Enrolled | |
2011-06-08 | House Enrolled; House Journal 51, PG.1724 | |
2011-05-25 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 46, PG.1581 | |
2011-05-12 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for May 25 (Vote 13-1; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 41, PG.1392 | |
2011-04-12 | House Public Hearing: 4/19/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 ==Executive Session To Follow== | |
2011-03-28 | House Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; House Journal 30, PG.1037 | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 10, Pg.187 | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 10, Pg.185 | |
2011-03-17 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/23/11; Senate Calendar 16 | |
2011-03-10 | Senate Hearing: 3/17/11, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 1:15 p.m.; Senate Calendar 15 | |
2011-01-19 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Judiciary, Senate Journal 3, Pg.39 |