NH SB177 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-09-18 - House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/18/2012 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306
Pending: House Executive Departments and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-09-18 - House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/18/2012 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306
Pending: House Executive Departments and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to training of directors and officers of nonprofit corporations.
Title
Relative to training of directors and officers of nonprofit corporations.
Sponsors
Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Rep. Russell Day [R] | Sen. Bob Odell [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-01-18 - Senate - Laid on Table (Y: 9 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-18 | House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/18/2012 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2012-06-20 | House Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 6/26/2012 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2012-06-13 | House Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 6/20/2012 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2012-06-07 | House Referred to Executive Departments and Administration for Interim Study; House Calendar 45, PG.2433 | |
2012-05-15 | House Refer to Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 43, PG.2283 | |
2012-05-08 | House Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study for May 15 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 37, PG.2031 | |
2012-04-20 | House Executive Session: 5/8/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2012-04-19 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 4/24/2012 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2012-04-04 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 4/19/2012 8:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2012-02-29 | House ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 3/12/2012 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2012-02-21 | House ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 3/13/2012 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2012-02-14 | House ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 3/8/2012 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2012-02-08 | House Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 15, PG.848 | |
2012-01-18 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 0011s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 2, Pg.50 | |
2012-01-18 | Senate Sen. Kelly Moved Laid On Table, Regular Calendar 9Y-15N, Motion Failed; Senate Journal 2, Pg.49 | |
2012-01-18 | Senate Committee Amendment 0011s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 2, Pg.49 | |
2012-01-12 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2012-0011s, 1/18/12; Senate Calendar 3 | |
2011-09-01 | Senate Work Session on Re-referred Bill: 9/8/11, Room 100, State House, 10:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 36 | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 9, Pg.134 | |
2011-03-09 | Senate Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 3/16/11; Senate Calendar 15 | |
2011-02-04 | Senate Hearing: 2/10/11, Room 100 State House, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 10 | |
2011-01-19 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration, Senate Journal 3, Pg.39 |