NH SB185 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Passed on July 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-15 - II. Remainder Effective 07/15/13
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Passed on July 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-15 - II. Remainder Effective 07/15/13
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a commission on housing policy and regulation.
Title
Establishing a commission on housing policy and regulation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-15 | Senate | II. Remainder Effective 07/15/13 |
2013-07-15 | Senate | I. Section 3 Effective 11/01/14 |
2013-07-15 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/15/13; Chapter 0233 |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-06-26 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 52, PG.1713 |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2013-2179e Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-06-12 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2179e Adopted [Recess of 6/5/13]; House Journal 49, PG.1656 |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Sen. Boutin Moved Concur with House Amendment 1476h, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-05-22 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #1476h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 43, PG.1470 |
2013-05-22 | House | Amendment #1476h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 43, PG.1470 |
2013-05-09 | House | Proposed Committee Amendment #2013-1476h; House Calendar39, PG.1334 |
2013-05-09 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #1476h for May 22 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar39, PG.1261 |
2013-04-30 | House | Continued Executive Session: 5/7/2013 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2013-04-24 | House | Executive Session: 4/30/2013 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 ==RECESSED== |
2013-04-17 | House | Public Hearing: 4/24/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301 ==Or Following House Session== |
2013-04-03 | House | Referred to Municipal and County Government; House Journal 35, PG.1126 |
2013-04-03 | House | Vacated from Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 35, PG.1126 |
2013-03-27 | House | Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 31, PG.1075 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0500s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 6 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0500s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-0500s, 3/7/13; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 10 |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Hearing: 2/20/13, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:45 a.m.; Senate Calendar 9 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Public & Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 5 |