NH SB19 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-18 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/18/2012; Chapter 0235; Effective 08/17/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-18 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/18/2012; Chapter 0235; Effective 08/17/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the definition and designation of prime wetlands.
Title
Relative to the definition and designation of prime wetlands.
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Odell [R] | Sen. James Rausch [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-18 | Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/18/2012; Chapter 0235; Effective 08/17/2012 | |
2012-06-06 | Senate Enrolled | |
2012-06-06 | House Enrolled; House Journal 51, PG.2613 | |
2012-06-06 | Senate Conference Committee Report 2396c; Adopted, Voice Vote | |
2012-06-06 | House Conference Committee Report #2396c Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 51, PG.2539-2540 | |
2012-05-30 | House Conference Committee Report #2012-2396c, House Amendment + New Amendment, Filed; House Calendar 42, PG.2263 | |
2012-05-29 | Senate Conferee Change; Senator Gallus Replaces Senator Merrill | |
2012-05-29 | House Conferee Change: Rep Haefner Replaces Rep Spang; House Journal 46, PG.2496 | |
2012-05-22 | Senate Committee of Conference Meeting: 5/29/2012, 11:00 a.m., Room 100, State House | |
2012-05-18 | House Conferee Change: Rep W.Hutchinson Replaces Rep Pettengill; House Journal 46, PG.2496 | |
2012-05-16 | Senate Committee of Conference Meeting: 5/22/2012, 11:00 a.m., Room 100, State House | |
2012-05-15 | House Speaker Appoints: Reps Renzullo, Pettengill, Kappler, and Spang; House Journal 43, PG.2281 | |
2012-05-15 | House House Accedes to Senate Request for Committee of Conference: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 43, PG.2281 | |
2012-04-25 | Senate President Appoints: Senators Odell, Merrill, and Lambert | |
2012-03-21 | Senate Sen. Odell Moved Non-concur with House Amendment #2590h; New Title, Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote | |
2012-01-04 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #2590h(NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 7, PG.422-423 | |
2012-01-04 | House Amendment #2590h(NT) Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 7, PG.422-423 | |
2011-11-02 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #2011-2590h (New Title); House Calendar 69, PG.2187-2188 | |
2011-11-02 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2590h(NT) for Jan 4 (Vote 14-1; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 70, PG.2209 | |
2011-09-13 | House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/25/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2011-09-09 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/27/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2011-07-26 | House Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 8/9/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2011-05-24 | House Retained in Committee | |
2011-05-19 | House Executive Session: 5/24/2011 11:15 PM Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2011-05-18 | House Full Committee Work Session: 5/23/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 | |
2011-05-18 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 5/23/2011 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 | |
2011-05-10 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 5/17/2011 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2011-05-04 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 5/10/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2011-04-04 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 4/6/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2011-02-09 | House Public Hearing: 2/17/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2011-02-07 | House Introduced (in Recess from 1/26/2011) and Referred to Resources, Recreation and Development; House Journal 14, PG.265 | |
2011-02-03 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 4, Pg.42 | |
2011-02-03 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 0092s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 4, Pg.41 | |
2011-02-03 | Senate Committee Amendment 0092s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 4, Pg.41 | |
2011-01-27 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2011-0092s, 2/3/2011; Senate Calendar 9 | |
2011-01-05 | Senate Hearing: 1/13/2011, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 6 | |
2011-01-04 | Senate Introduced 1/5/2011 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources, Senate Journal 1, Pg.20 |