NH SB19 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/03/2021 House Journal 8 P. 114
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/03/2021 House Journal 8 P. 114
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the degree granting authority of Signum university.
Title
Relative to the degree granting authority of Signum university.
Sponsors
Sen. Ruth Ward [R] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Sen. Denise Ricciardi [R] | Sen. Erin Hennessey [R] |
Sen. Jay Kahn [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-04 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/03/2021 House Journal 8 P. 114 |
2021-05-25 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 20-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 26 P. 19 |
2021-05-12 | House | Executive Session: 05/20/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92551660487 |
2021-03-17 | House | Public Hearing: 03/25/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/96421714087 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-03-10 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 02/25/2021 and referred to Education House Journal 4 P. 48 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 20Y-4N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 02/04/2021; Senate Journal 3 |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/04/2021; Senate Calendar 9 |
2021-01-07 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 01/12/2021, 09:30 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 6 |
2021-01-05 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/06/2021 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 2 |