NH SB20 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 202-135 05/08/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to notification requirements for employees, workplace inspections, and the youth employment law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to notification requirements for employees, workplace inspections, and the youth employment law.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-08 - Senate - OTP (Y: 202 N: 135 NV: 33 Abs: 30) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-08HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 202-135 05/08/2019
2019-04-25HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-04-25HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 05/08/2019 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 16
2019-04-17HouseExecutive Session: 04/24/2019 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 305-307
2019-04-10HousePublic Hearing: 04/17/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 307
2019-03-28HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services House Journal 11 P. 72
2019-03-21SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0993s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/21/2019; Senate Journal 9
2019-03-21SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-0993s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/21/2019; Senate Journal 9
2019-03-13SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0993s, 03/21/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 14
2019-01-17SenateHearing: 01/22/2019, Room 100, State House, 03:00 pm; Senate Calendar 7
2019-01-14SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback