NH SB201 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on May 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-28 - Signed by the Governor on 05/27/2014; Chapter 0069; Effective 01/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on May 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-28 - Signed by the Governor on 05/27/2014; Chapter 0069; Effective 01/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to marriage registration forms.
Title
Relative to marriage registration forms.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-28 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 05/27/2014; Chapter 0069; Effective 01/01/2015 |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled 04/24/2014 |
2014-05-01 | House | Enrolled (In recess of 4/30/14) |
2014-04-21 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #1457eba Adopted, Voice Vote (In Recess from 4/16/14) |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2014-1457e Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-04-16 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-04-10 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 16-1; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 27 |
2014-04-02 | House | Executive Session: 4/8/14 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 |
2014-03-19 | House | Public Hearing: 4/1/2014 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 |
2014-03-13 | House | Introduced and Referred to Judiciary |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0557s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0557s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0557s, 2/19/14; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 7 |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Hearing: === TIME CHANGE === 2/11/14, Room 100, State House, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 6 |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Hearing: 2/11/14, Room 100, State House, 9:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 5 |
2013-12-11 | Senate | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Judiciary |