NH SB205 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-27 - House Conference Committee Report #2162, House Amendment, Filed; House Calendar 43, PG.2157
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-27 - House Conference Committee Report #2162, House Amendment, Filed; House Calendar 43, PG.2157
Summary
Making various changes to the criminal statutes.
Title
Making various changes to the criminal statutes.
Sponsors
Sen. Betsi DeVries [D] | Sen. Michael Downing [R] | Sen. Bob Odell [R] | Sen. Deborah Reynolds [D] |
Rep. Joy Tilton [D] | Rep. David Welch [R] | Sen. Margaret Wood Hassan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-27 | House Conference Committee Report #2162, House Amendment, Filed; House Calendar 43, PG.2157 | |
2010-05-21 | Senate Committee of Conference Meeting: 5/25/2010 8:30 a.m., Room 103, State House | |
2010-05-19 | House Speaker Appoints: Reps Welch, Chandley, Shurtleff & Mack; House Journal 46, PG.2240 | |
2010-05-19 | House House Accedes to Request for Comm of Conf (Rep Hess): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 46, PG.2240 | |
2010-05-19 | Senate President Appoints: Senators Hassan, Reynolds and Downing; Senate Journal 20, Pg.644 | |
2010-05-19 | Senate Sen. Reynolds Moved Nonconcur with House Amendment 1908h, 0041h; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 20, Pg. | |
2010-03-03 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 20, PG.1166 | |
2010-02-12 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 3 Consent Calendar (Vote 14-0); House Calendar 17, PG.817 | |
2010-02-02 | House Executive Session: 2/11/2010 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2010-01-26 | House Public Hearing: 2/2/2010 10:20 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2010-01-13 | House Referred to Ways and Means; House Journal 9, PG.382 | |
2010-01-13 | House Ought to Pass with Amendments #1908h and #2010-0041h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 9, PG.376-382 | |
2010-01-13 | House Floor Amendment #2010-0041h (Rep Shurtleff) Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 9, PG.379-382 | |
2010-01-13 | House Amendment #1908h Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 9, PG.377-379 | |
2010-01-06 | House Special Ordered to Next Session Date in Regular Calendar Order; House Journal 6, PG.310 | |
2009-11-09 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #1908h; House Calendar 1, PG.74-76 | |
2009-11-09 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #1908h for Jan 6 Regular Calendar (vote 16-0); House Calendar 2, PG.92 | |
2009-09-24 | House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 11/5/2009 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2009-09-16 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/30/2009 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2009-08-05 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 8/20/2009 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2009-06-25 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 6/30/2009 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2009-05-28 | House Retained in Committee | |
2009-05-19 | House ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 5/28/2009 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2009-05-19 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 5/26/2009 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2009-05-13 | House ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 5/21/2009 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 ==RECESSED== | |
2009-05-07 | House ==TIME CHANGE== Subcommittee Work Session: 5/19/2009 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204 (Orig 10:00 Amendment) | |
2009-04-28 | House ==TIME CHANGE== Executive Session: 5/7/2009 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204 (Orig 10:00 Amendment) ==RECESSED== | |
2009-04-28 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 4/30/2009 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2009-04-21 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 4/28/2009 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2009-04-15 | House ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 4/23/2009 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2009-04-15 | House Public Hearing: 4/21/2009 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2009-04-09 | House Introduced and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety; House Journal 33, PG.1425 | |
2009-04-08 | Senate Passed By Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 11, Pg.228 | |
2009-04-08 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 1166s 1281s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 11, Pg.222 | |
2009-04-08 | Senate Sen. Houde Floor Amendment 1281s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 11, Pg.221-222 | |
2009-04-08 | Senate Committee Amendment 1166s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 11, Pg.219-221 | |
2009-04-02 | Senate Committee Report; Ought to Pass with Amendment1166s [04/08/09]; Senate Calendar 18, Pgs.29-31 | |
2009-03-11 | Senate Judiciary Committee to ACT on SB 205-FN after the dealine; Motion Adopted, Voice Vote (Nec. 2/3) | |
2009-03-11 | Senate Sen. Hassan moved that Senate Rule 48(e) be suspended to allow the | |
2009-03-11 | Senate Judiciary Committee to ACT on SB 205-FN after the deadline; Motion Failed, Division Vote 14Y - 9N (Not Nec. 2/3) | |
2009-03-11 | Senate Sen. Hassan moved that Senate Rule 48(e) be suspended to allow the | |
2009-03-11 | Senate Hearing; March 24, 2009, Room 103, State House, 2:45 p.m.; Senate Calendar 15 | |
2009-03-04 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal6, Pg.85 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=1042&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |