NH SB212 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-06 - House House Refuses to Accede to Senate Request for C of C (Rep Stepanek): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 51, PG.2589-2590
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-06 - House House Refuses to Accede to Senate Request for C of C (Rep Stepanek): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 51, PG.2589-2590
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to pooled risk management programs.
Title
Relative to pooled risk management programs.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Azarian [R] | Sen. John Barnes [R] | Sen. David Boutin [R] | Sen. John Gallus [R] |
Sen. Gary Lambert [R] | Sen. Jim Luther [R] | Rep. Frank Sapareto [R] | Rep. Pamela Tucker [R] |
Sen. Raymond White [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-28 - Senate - Sen. White Floor Amendment 1467s (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-06 | House House Refuses to Accede to Senate Request for C of C (Rep Stepanek): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 51, PG.2589-2590 | |
2012-05-23 | Senate President Appoints: Senators Prescott, Forrester, and Houde | |
2012-05-23 | Senate Sen. Prescott Moved Non-concur with House Amendment #2155h; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Div 11Y-9N | |
2012-05-17 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #2155h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 46, PG.2470-2472 | |
2012-05-17 | House Amendment #2155h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 46, PG.2470-2472 | |
2012-05-09 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #2012-2155h; House Calendar 37, PG.2063-2066 | |
2012-05-09 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2155h for May 15 (Vote 21-0; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 37, PG.2049 | |
2012-05-08 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 5/9/2012 Legislative Office Building 202 Immediately Following House Session ==Executive Session To Follow== | |
2012-05-04 | House ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 5/8/2012 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2012-05-04 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 5/8/2012 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2012-05-01 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 5/3/2012 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2012-04-26 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 5/1/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2012-04-24 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 4/26/2012 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2012-04-17 | House Public Hearing: 4/24/2012 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2012-04-11 | House Vacated from Commerce and Consumer Affairs and Referred to Ways and Means: Motion Adopted Voice Vote | |
2012-04-04 | House ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 4/17/2012 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2012-04-04 | House ==CANCELLED== Full Committee Work Session: 4/17/2012 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2012-04-04 | House ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 4/12/2012 3:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302-304 ==Insurance/Consumer Protection Div== | |
2012-03-29 | House Introduced and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 32, PG. 1913 | |
2012-03-28 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 1424s, 1495s, 1448s, 1467s, 1466s, 1469s , 1468s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 8, Pg.327 | |
2012-03-28 | Senate Sen. Prescott Floor Amendment #2012-1468s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 8, Pg.313 | |
2012-03-28 | Senate Sen. Prescott Floor Amendment #2012-1470s, Division 2Y-22N, Amendment Failed; Senate Journal 8, Pg.313 | |
2012-03-28 | Senate Sen. Prescott Floor Amendment #2012-1474s, Division 9Y-15N, Amendment Failed; Senate Journal 8, Pg.312 | |
2012-03-28 | Senate Sen. Prescott Floor Amendment #2012-1469s, Division 13Y-11N, Amendment Adopted; Senate Journal 8, Pg.312 | |
2012-03-28 | Senate Sen. Morse Floor Amendment #2012-1466s, Division 17Y-7N, Amendment Adopted; Senate Journal 8, Pg.311 | |
2012-03-28 | Senate Sen. White Floor Amendment #2012-1467s, Regular Calendar 17Y-7N, Amendment Adopted; Senate Journal 8, Pg.311 | |
2012-03-28 | Senate Sen. White Floor Amendment #2012-1448s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 8, Pg.310 | |
2012-03-28 | Senate Sen. White Floor Amendment #2012-1495s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 8, Pg.310 | |
2012-03-28 | Senate Committee Amendment 1424s; Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 8, Pg.309 | |
2012-03-28 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2012-1424s, 3/28/12 | |
2012-03-28 | Senate Special Order to the afternoon session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; Senate Journal 8, Pg.262 | |
2012-03-23 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2012-1424s, 3/28/12; Senate Calendar 12 | |
2012-03-21 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 1215s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote, Refer to Finance Rule 4-3 | |
2012-03-21 | Senate Committee Amendment 1215s; Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 7, Pg.195 | |
2012-03-14 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2012-1215s, 3/21/12; Senate Calendar 11 | |
2012-02-09 | Senate Hearing: 2/14/12, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:40 a.m.; Senate Calendar 7 | |
2012-01-01 | Senate Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 1, Pg.3 |